This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 02:26:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. WILLIAM LYONS

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM LYONS. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********27CV

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

William Lyons A/K/A WILLIAM A LYONS

William A Lyons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGLIACCIO, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Anthony J. Migliaccio, Jr., Esq.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of S&C Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-WILLIAM LYONS A/K/A WILLIAM A LYONS-42419657

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-WILLIAM LYONS A/K/A WILLIAM A LYONS-42419657; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - William Lyons aka

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - William Lyons aka; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, William Lyons AKA

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, William Lyons AKA; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of S&C Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-WILLIAM LYONS A/K/A WILLIAM A LYONS-42419657; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - William Lyons aka; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, William Lyons AKA; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less