This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 03/19/2023 at 19:20:25 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. Tab Gravlee

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tab Gravlee. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Greene, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Tab Gravlee AKA Tab H Gravlee

Tab h Gravlee Aka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGLIACCIO, ANTHONY J

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/23/2022; Received: 05/23/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/23/2022; Received: 05/23/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY of a Judgment entered on 5/2/22

NOTICE OF ENTRY of a Judgment entered on 5/2/22; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/23/2022; Received: 05/23/2022

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2022; Received: 05/02/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

AFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAB GRAVLEE A/K/A TAB H GRAVLEE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAB GRAVLEE A/K/A TAB H GRAVLEE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/25/2022; Received: 03/25/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/17/2022; Received: 01/17/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-Tab Gravlee a/k/a Tab H Gravlee-49265948

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-Tab Gravlee a/k/a Tab H Gravlee-49265948; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/17/2022; Received: 01/17/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Moseman, S.; Filed: 01/04/2022; Received: 01/04/2022

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Moseman, S.; Filed: 01/04/2022; Received: 01/04/2022

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/23/2022; Received: 05/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/23/2022; Received: 05/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY of a Judgment entered on 5/2/22; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/23/2022; Received: 05/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2022; Received: 05/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support With Regard to Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAB GRAVLEE A/K/A TAB H GRAVLEE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/29/2022; Received: 04/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/25/2022; Received: 03/25/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/17/2022; Received: 01/17/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-Tab Gravlee a/k/a Tab H Gravlee-49265948; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/17/2022; Received: 01/17/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Moseman, S.; Filed: 01/04/2022; Received: 01/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Moseman, S.; Filed: 01/04/2022; Received: 01/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less