This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 19:37:38 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. STUART AMORIELL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STUART AMORIELL. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0085

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Stuart Amoriell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERHAGEN, JASON PETER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - STUART AMORIELL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - STUART AMORIELL; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2021; Received: 06/04/2021

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Sage, K.; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2021; Received: 06/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - STUART AMORIELL; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Diaz, R.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less