Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 14:32:03 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. SEAN WASZKIEWICZ

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEAN WASZKIEWICZ. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott J Delconte. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Scott J Delconte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Sean g Waszkiewicz A/k/a

Sean Waszkiewicz A/K/A SEAN G WASZKIEWICZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGLIACCIO, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Anthony J. Migliaccio, Jr., Esq.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01)

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Received: 08/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #01) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #01) *Corrected*; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #01)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #01)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation with regard to Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation with regard to Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SEAN WASZKIEWICZ A/K/A SEAN G WASZKIEWICZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SEAN WASZKIEWICZ A/K/A SEAN G WASZKIEWICZ; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT WASZKIEWICZ, SEAN

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT WASZKIEWICZ, SEAN; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #01) *Corrected*; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service of S&C- Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation with regard to Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SEAN WASZKIEWICZ A/K/A SEAN G WASZKIEWICZ; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT WASZKIEWICZ, SEAN; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less