This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 13:07:56 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. SAMUEL HIPOLYTE AKA et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SAMUEL HIPOLYTE AKA. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Samuel Hipolyte AKA

Samuel Hippolyte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGLIACCIO, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Anthony J. Migliaccio, Jr., Esq.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment entered 5/31/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment entered 5/31/2019; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SAMUEL HIPOLYTE A/K/A SAMUEL HIPPOLYTE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SAMUEL HIPOLYTE A/K/A SAMUEL HIPPOLYTE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT HIPOLYTE

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT HIPOLYTE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment entered 5/31/2019; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SAMUEL HIPOLYTE A/K/A SAMUEL HIPPOLYTE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT HIPOLYTE; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less