This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 19:37:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. MICHELLE HOGAN et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHELLE HOGAN. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0087

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Michelle Hogan AKA MICHELLE RENEE HOGAN

ELEMENT DAY SPA & SALON L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAKAS, JOSEPH KARL

VERHAGEN, JASON PETER

JACKLING, JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - MICHELLE HOGAN AKA MICHELLE RENEE HOGAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - MICHELLE HOGAN AKA MICHELLE RENEE HOGAN; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - ELEMENT DAY SPA & SALON L.L.C

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - ELEMENT DAY SPA & SALON L.L.C; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2021; Received: 06/17/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) judgment

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) judgment; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

AFFIRMATION 3215G

AFFIRMATION 3215G; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Military Investigation

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Military Investigation; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Military Investigation; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION 3215G; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) judgment; Filed By: Jackling, J. - filed by Monteleone, T.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2021; Received: 06/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - ELEMENT DAY SPA & SALON L.L.C; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - MICHELLE HOGAN AKA MICHELLE RENEE HOGAN; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Murphy, D.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less