This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 00:59:03 (UTC).

American Express National Bank v. Judith Heenan

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 American Express National Bank filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Judith Heenan. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

Judith Heenan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

Defendant Attorney

MCINTYRE, JOHN FRANCIS

Attorney at National Litigation Law Group, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Mcintyre, J.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JUDITH HEENAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JUDITH HEENAN; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Mcintyre, J.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JUDITH HEENAN; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less