Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 21:04:39 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. JOY ARCHAMBAULT

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOY ARCHAMBAULT. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7-19

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Joy Archambault A/K/A JOY A ARCHAMBAULT

A/K/A JOY A ARCHAMBAULT

Joy A Archambault

Joy Archambault - A/K/A A/K/A JOY A ARCHAMBAULT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGLIACCIO, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Anthony J. Migliaccio, Jr., Esq.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment entered 12/3/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment entered 12/3/2019; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

JUDGMENT entered by clerk

JUDGMENT entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Joy Archambault aka

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Joy Archambault aka; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of a Judgment entered 12/3/2019; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Service of S&C - Additional Mailing; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Service of S&C Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Joy Archambault aka; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, Joy Archambault aka Joy A Archambault; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less