Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 20:00:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. JONATHAN JASSEY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONATHAN JASSEY. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Jonathan Jassey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGLIACCIO, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Anthony J. Migliaccio, Jr., Esq.

Defendant Attorney

GRANAT, JEFFREY A

Attorney at JACOBSON GOLDBERG & KULB, LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Granat, J.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-JONATHAN JASSEY-42738913

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-JONATHAN JASSEY-42738913; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, Jonathan Jassey

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, Jonathan Jassey; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Granat, J.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-JONATHAN JASSEY-42738913; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons + Complaint, Jonathan Jassey; Filed By: Migliaccio, A. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less