Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/29/2020 at 06:03:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. HANNAH HERSKOVITZ et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HANNAH HERSKOVITZ. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Hannah Herskovitz

Monroe, NY 10950

1 EXPRESS USA CORP AKA 1 EXPRESS USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOEFS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Doyle & Hoefs, LLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BRONSTEIN, JOSHUA REID

Attorney at The Law Offices of Joshua R.Bronstein & Associates, PLLC

 

Court Documents

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bronstein, J.; Filed: 03/14/2020; Received: 03/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bronstein, J.; Filed: 03/14/2020; Received: 03/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hoefs, M. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less