This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 12:28:56 (UTC).

American Express National Bank v. Gene Edwards et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gene Edwards. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0203

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendants

Gene's Paving & Sealing, Inc.

Gene Edwards aka Gene R. Edwards

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 02/10/2021; Received: 02/10/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/13/2021; Received: 02/13/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/13/2021; Received: 02/13/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIRMATION of facts

AFFIRMATION of facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIDAVIT non-military affidavit

AFFIDAVIT non-military affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIDAVIT of Compliance

AFFIDAVIT of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS from original creditor

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS from original creditor; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Billing Statements

EXHIBIT(S) - B Billing Statements; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Final Account Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Final Account Statement; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2021; Received: 10/06/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2021; Received: 10/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Final Account Statement; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Billing Statements; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS from original creditor; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non-military affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION of facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/13/2021; Received: 02/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 02/13/2021; Received: 02/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 02/10/2021; Received: 02/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/22/2021; Received: 01/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less