This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 13:36:16 (UTC).

American Express National Bank v. Eileen Chinsky

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 American Express National Bank filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Eileen Chinsky. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas Feinman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas Feinman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

Eileen Chinsky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Non Military Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Non Military Affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Statements

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Statements; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Defendant Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Defendant Answer; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Compliance

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff Affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EILEEN CHINSKY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EILEEN CHINSKY; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Non Military Affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Statements; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Defendant Answer; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff Affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EILEEN CHINSKY; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less