This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 20:41:39 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. CORY OLANDER

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CORY OLANDER. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1169

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

Cory Olander AKA CORY T OLANDER

Cory T Olander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

WALLACE, STEPHANIE MARIE

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR EFILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR EFILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Cory Olander AKA Cory T Olander

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Cory Olander AKA Cory T Olander; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR EFILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Loos, R.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Cory Olander AKA Cory T Olander; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less