Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 19:35:40 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. BHARRAT JAGDEO

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BHARRAT JAGDEO. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Bharrat Jagdeo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALLACE, STEPHANIE MARIE

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

JAKAS, JOSEPH KARL

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

GRECO, LOUIS CARL

Attorney at Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., PLLC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Colunga, V.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Colunga, V.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - Bharrat Jagdeo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - Bharrat Jagdeo; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Bharrat Jagdeo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Bharrat Jagdeo; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Greco, L.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Colunga, V.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Jakas, J. - filed by Colunga, V.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - Bharrat Jagdeo; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Bharrat Jagdeo; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Greco, L.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less