Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 17:13:52 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v. ANA PERKOVIC

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANA PERKOVIC. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Ana Perkovic AKA ANA M PERKOVIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALLACE, STEPHANIE MARIE

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

VERHAGEN, JASON PETER

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-ANA PERKOVIC AKA ANA M PERKOVIC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-ANA PERKOVIC AKA ANA M PERKOVIC; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, PC; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-ANA PERKOVIC AKA ANA M PERKOVIC; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker and Associates; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less