This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 11:50:16 (UTC).

American Express Centurion Bank - v. - Dale Bowins aka Dale W. Bowins

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 American Express Centurion Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dale Bowins aka Dale W Bowins. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James F Matthews. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James F Matthews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Centurion Bank

Defendant

Dale bowins Aka Dale w. bowins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - 325(d) (Motion #001) SFO by J. Luft 325d matter to J. Matthews. Mot Seq 001 remains but now reflects judge/part change an ... show more

ORDER - 325(d) (Motion #001) SFO by J. Luft 325d matter to J. Matthews. Mot Seq 001 remains but now reflects judge/part change an ... show more; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - E judgment; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D account statement

EXHIBIT(S) - D account statement; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C terms and conditions

EXHIBIT(S) - C terms and conditions; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B affidavit of compliance

EXHIBIT(S) - B affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A pleadings; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

AFFIRMATION attorney affirmation

AFFIRMATION attorney affirmation; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001) OSC - VD - Pro Se Hard Copy

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001) OSC - VD - Pro Se Hard Copy; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Hard Copy Filing @ CC Office. affidavit in support of notification

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Hard Copy Filing @ CC Office. affidavit in support of notification; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DALE BOWINS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DALE BOWINS; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - 325(d) (Motion #001) SFO by J. Luft 325d matter to J. Matthews. Mot Seq 001 remains but now reflects judge/part change and new date of 3/5/19. Appearance required.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E judgment; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D account statement; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C terms and conditions; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A pleadings; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION attorney affirmation; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001) OSC - VD - Pro Se Hard Copy; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2018; Received: 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Hard Copy Filing @ CC Office. affidavit in support of notification; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Hard Copy Filing @ CC Office. pro se placecard; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Terms and Conditions; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DALE BOWINS; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less