This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:18:32 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB - v. - JOHN HENRY

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JOHN HENRY. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

John Henry AKA JOHN M HENRY

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Withdraw letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Withdraw letter; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Procedural History

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Procedural History; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER General Case Assignment

RJI -RE: OTHER General Case Assignment; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - JOHN HENRY AKA JOHN M HENRY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - JOHN HENRY AKA JOHN M HENRY; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Withdraw letter; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Procedural History; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER General Case Assignment; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - JOHN HENRY AKA JOHN M HENRY; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less