This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:41:16 (UTC).

ALVIN RICHARD et al - v. - 1711 LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 ALVIN RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1711 LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alvin Richard

Melanie Richard

Defendants and Petitioners

1711 LLC

RYDER CONSTRUCTION INC.

Respondents

McCormack Contracting Inc.

CONSTRUCTION REALTY SAFETY GROUP, INC.

EXCLUSIVE DRYWALL AND CONCRETE FINISHING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEMEROV, JEFFREY A

Attorney at SEGAN NEMEROV & SINGER PC

Petitioner Attorney

MATTHEW J MINERO MATTHEW RYAN AUER MITCHELL GALEY ZYSERMAN

Defendant Attorneys

AUER, MATTHEW RYAN

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

MINERO, MATTHEW J

Attorney at KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK, LLP

ZYSERMAN, MITCHELL GALEY

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck

Respondent Attorneys

JERRY CARMELO GUARINO ANDREW M ROHER

ERIN M. MCGINNIS

ROBERT C BAXTER

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginnis, E. - filed by The Law Office of Erin M McGinnis; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Mcginnis, E. - filed by The Law Office of Erin M McGinnis; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

DEMAND FOR: 2ND COMBINED DEMANDS TO EXCLUSIVE DRYWALL AND CONCRETE FINISHING

DEMAND FOR: 2ND COMBINED DEMANDS TO EXCLUSIVE DRYWALL AND CONCRETE FINISHING; Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary Conference Request

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary Conference Request; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Additional Copy of Third-Party Summpns and Complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Additional Copy of Third-Party Summpns and Complaint; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Third-Party Complaint on McCormack Contracting

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Third-Party Complaint on McCormack Contracting; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Defendant 1711 LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Defendant 1711 LLC; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant Ryder Construction Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant Ryder Construction Inc.; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 07/15/2017; Received: 07/15/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 07/15/2017; Received: 07/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginnis, E. - filed by The Law Office of Erin M McGinnis; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Mcginnis, E. - filed by The Law Office of Erin M McGinnis; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2ND COMBINED DEMANDS TO EXCLUSIVE DRYWALL AND CONCRETE FINISHING; Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Roher, A. - filed by Bartlett LLP; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Filed By: Guarino, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary Conference Request; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Additional Copy of Third-Party Summpns and Complaint; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Third-Party Complaint on McCormack Contracting; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Defendant 1711 LLC; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant Ryder Construction Inc.; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 07/15/2017; Received: 07/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Minero, M.; Filed: 07/15/2017; Received: 07/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nemerov, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less