This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 03/17/2023 at 10:59:37 (UTC).

Alvaro Icard Castillo v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Alvaro Icard Castillo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Metropolitan Transportation Authority. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Greene, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell J Danziger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********021E

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mitchell J Danziger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvaro Icard Castillo

Defendants

Metropolitan Transportation Authority

New York City Transit Authority

MABSTOA

MTA BUS COMPANY

CITY OF NEW YORK

Johanica Blake

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMATO, RYAN JOHN

RABINOWITZ, MATTHEW IRA

ELEFTERAKIS, NICHOLAS

MAGILL, MELISSA NICOLE

Defendant Attorneys

CAHN, JENNIFER BETH

Counsel, Corporation

BROWN, BRENDAN WAYNE

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2)

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Dashcam Footage

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Dashcam Footage; Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support with Certification of Word Count

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support with Certification of Word Count; Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Reply to Statement of Material Facts and Counter Statement of Material Facts

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Reply to Statement of Material Facts and Counter Statement of Material Facts; Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 12/09/2022; Received: 12/09/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Statutory Hearing Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Statutory Hearing Transcript; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants' Response to CSO

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants' Response to CSO; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Counsel, C.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/08/2021; Received: 09/08/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 08/16/2021

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Dashcam Footage; Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support with Certification of Word Count; Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Reply to Statement of Material Facts and Counter Statement of Material Facts; Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Cahn, J.; Filed: 12/09/2022; Received: 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Statutory Hearing Transcript; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants' Response to CSO; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Supplemental BP; Filed By: Rabinowitz, M.; Filed: 11/11/2022; Received: 11/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ghaznavi, F.; Filed: 11/19/2021; Received: 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Counsel, C.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/08/2021; Received: 09/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 08/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less