This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 18:32:30 (UTC).

Ally Financial Inc. v. Todd O Laraba et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Ally Financial Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Todd O Laraba. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew J. Murphy. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew J. Murphy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

Todd O Laraba

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOMBREA, JULIA CLAIRE

Attorney at NESPER, FERBER, DIGIACOMO, JOHNSON & GRIMM, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - SEIZURE (Motion #1)

ORDER - SEIZURE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SEIZURE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less