Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 21:15:42 (UTC).

Ally Financial Inc. - v. - Matthew J Edwards et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 Ally Financial Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Matthew J Edwards. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1165

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Financial Inc.

Defendants

George P Lockwood jr

John Doe

Matthew J Edwards

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOMBREA, JULIA CLAIRE

Attorney at NESPER, FERBER, DIGIACOMO, JOHNSON & GRIMM, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Notice of Default

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Notice of Default; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT (Motion #01) Signed 9/29/17

ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT (Motion #01) Signed 9/29/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #01)

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) Letter Adjourning Hearing

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) Letter Adjourning Hearing; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Service on Matthew J. Edwards

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Service on Matthew J. Edwards; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Service on George P. Lockwood

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Service on George P. Lockwood; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #01) Signed 06-20-17

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #01) Signed 06-20-17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit, Contract, Bond, Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit, Contract, Bond, Lien; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #01)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Notice of Default; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT (Motion #01) Signed 9/29/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) Letter Adjourning Hearing; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Service on Matthew J. Edwards; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Service on George P. Lockwood; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #01) Signed 06-20-17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit, Contract, Bond, Lien; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mombrea, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less