Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 21:07:05 (UTC).

Allied Area Realty Corp. et al - v. - Town of Colonie et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Allied Area Realty Corp filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Town of Colonie. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allied Area Realty Corp.

688 Loudon Road Realty LLC

400 Old Loudon Road Realty LLC

Defendants

Town of Colonie

Assessor of the Town of Colonie

Board of Assessment Review

Not Yet Classified

North Colonie Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWNE, ERIKA C

Attorney at GOLDMAN ATTORNEYS PLLC

GOLDMAN, PAUL J

Attorney at Goldman Attorneys PLLC

Defendant Attorney

ALMY, STEPHEN MARK

Attorney at The Vincelette Law Firm

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RYAN, WILLIAM FRANCIS

Attorney at TABNER RYAN & KENIRY

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE extension of scheduling

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE extension of scheduling; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Determinations

EXHIBIT(S) - C Determinations; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints

EXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Property Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Property Description; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE extension of scheduling; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Determinations; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Property Description; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less