This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:39:42 (UTC).

ALLENWORTH S DOYLEY - v. - DWAYNE G THORNHILL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ALLENWORTH S DOYLEY filed an Other lawsuit against DWAYNE G THORNHILL. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allenworth S Doyley

Defendant

Dwayne G Thornhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ofshtein, Akiva

Attorney at Ofshtein Law Firm, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

GHERLONE, JOHN MICHAEL

Attorney at JAMES F. BUTLER & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ofshtein, A. - filed by ofshtein law firm, p.c.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ofshtein, A. - filed by ofshtein law firm, p.c.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ANSWER ANS with Demands

ANSWER ANS with Demands; Filed By: Gherlone, J.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ofshtein, A. - filed by ofshtein law firm, p.c.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gherlone, J.; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gherlone, J.; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ANS with Demands; Filed By: Gherlone, J.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ofshtein, A. - filed by ofshtein law firm, p.c.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ofshtein, A. - filed by ofshtein law firm, p.c.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ofshtein, A. - filed by ofshtein law firm, p.c.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less