This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:42:00 (UTC).

ALLEN PARKER - v. - LI RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES, LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ALLEN PARKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LI RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES, LP. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Parker

Defendants and Petitioners

1400 HOLDING CORP.,

LI RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES, LP

BURGER KING

Respondent

MYRTLE RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHESLEY, STEPHEN R.

Attorney at STEPHEN R. CHESLEY LLC

Petitioner Attorney

SALVATORE J DESANTIS (UN-992)

Defendant Attorneys

BESEN, STUART PAUL

Attorney at Milber Makris Plousadis and Seiden, LLP

DESANTIS, SALVATORE J

Attorney at MOLOD SPITZ & DESANTIS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dated 2/13/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dated 2/13/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #2) Rule 130 Certification

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #2) Rule 130 Certification; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Good faith correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Good faith correspondence; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Note of Issue & Certificate

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Note of Issue & Certificate; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) CCO 8-2-18

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) CCO 8-2-18; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Third-Party S&C and Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Third-Party S&C and Answer; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Pltf Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Pltf Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) S&C and Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) S&C and Answer; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 1-4-19 Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 1-4-19 Order; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Amended Verified Answer with Cross-Claim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Amended Verified Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Notice of Substitution of Counsel

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Notice of Substitution of Counsel; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Chesley, S.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chesley, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dated 2/13/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #2) Rule 130 Certification; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Good faith correspondence; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Note of Issue & Certificate; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) CCO 8-2-18; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Third-Party S&C and Answer; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Pltf Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) S&C and Answer; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 1-4-19 Order; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) Good faith Affirmation; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant 1400 Holding Corp; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Amended Verified Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Notice of Substitution of Counsel; Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Besen, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Chesley, S.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chesley, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less