Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:27:07 (UTC).

ALLEGANY MOUNTAIN RESORT, LLC v. AMY M. METZGER et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 ALLEGANY MOUNTAIN RESORT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMY M METZGER. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph Glownia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph Glownia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGANY MOUNTAIN RESORT, LLC dba ALLEGANY MOUNTAIN RESORT

Defendants

William A. Smierciak aka BILL A. SMIERCIAK

Amy M. Metzger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLD, DAVID J

Attorney at DAVID J. GOLD, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

FAUST, GEORGE R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE R. FAUST

 

Court Documents

NOTICE motion adjournment

NOTICE motion adjournment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion upon William A. Smierciak

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion upon William A. Smierciak; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Request for Judicial Intervention upon William A. Smierciak

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Request for Judicial Intervention upon William A. Smierciak; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) *Corrected* Affidavit of Service upon George R. Faust, Esq.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) *Corrected* Affidavit of Service upon George R. Faust, Esq.; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Proofs of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Proofs of Service; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Notice of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Notice of Default; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Membership Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Membership Agreement; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of David J. Gold, Esq.

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of David J. Gold, Esq.; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of David Geddes

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of David Geddes; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff's Certificate of Personal Delivery upon WILLIAM A. SMIERCIAK A/K/A BILL A. SMIERCIAK (Summon ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff's Certificate of Personal Delivery upon WILLIAM A. SMIERCIAK A/K/A BILL A. SMIERCIAK (Summon ... show more; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff's Certificate of Personal Delivery upon Amy Metzger (Summons, Verified Complaint and Notice ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff's Certificate of Personal Delivery upon Amy Metzger (Summons, Verified Complaint and Notice ... show more; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Faust, G.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE motion adjournment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion upon William A. Smierciak; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Request for Judicial Intervention upon William A. Smierciak; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) *Corrected* Affidavit of Service upon George R. Faust, Esq.; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Proofs of Service; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Notice of Default; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Membership Agreement; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of David J. Gold, Esq.; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of David Geddes; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff's Certificate of Personal Delivery upon WILLIAM A. SMIERCIAK A/K/A BILL A. SMIERCIAK (Summons, Verified Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing); Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff's Certificate of Personal Delivery upon Amy Metzger (Summons, Verified Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing); Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Faust, G.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gold, D.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less