This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 23:21:30 (UTC).

ALICIA NEWTON et al - v. - DEBORAH J MURAWSKI et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 ALICIA NEWTON filed an Other lawsuit against DEBORAH J MURAWSKI. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alicia Newton

Leonardo Newton Her Spouse

Defendants

Sandra M Murawski

Deborah J Murawski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, CHERIE LYNN

Attorney at LIPSITZ GREEN SCIME CAMBRIA LLP

Defendant Attorneys

DUBNICKI, DANIEL DAVID

Attorney at HAGELIN SPENCER, LLC

ORGANEK, MEGAN FURRER

Attorney at HAGELIN SPENCER, LLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIRMATION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

NO-FAULT IME REPORTS

EXHIBIT(S)

SEDONA HOLISTIC MEDICINE CENTER MEDS

EXHIBIT(S)

BRIAN MCGRATH, M.D. MEDS

EXHIBIT(S)

MIKHAIL STRUT, M.D. MEDS

EXHIBIT(S)

JERRY TRACY, M.D. MEDS

EXHIBIT(S)

ARTICLE 31 DEMANDS

EXHIBIT(S)

PLEADINGS

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Defendant, Deborah J. Murawski

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Defendant, Sandra M. Murawski

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #002); Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #002) NO-FAULT IME REPORTS; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) SEDONA HOLISTIC MEDICINE CENTER MEDS; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) BRIAN MCGRATH, M.D. MEDS; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) MIKHAIL STRUT, M.D. MEDS; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) JERRY TRACY, M.D. MEDS; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) BUFFALO REHAB PHYSICAL THERAPY MEDS; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) GOOD FAITH DATED 11/2/17; Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) ARTICLE 31 DEMANDS; Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PLEADINGS; Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Organek, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Dubnicki, D.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Dubnicki, D.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant, Deborah J. Murawski; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant, Sandra M. Murawski; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Peterson, C.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less