This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 01:06:37 (UTC).

ALI M. ABDULLA and SADEAIA ABDULLA - v. - JOANN MELISZ

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 ALI M ABDULLA and SADEAIA ABDULLA filed an Other lawsuit against JOANN MELISZ. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALI M. ABDULLA and SADEAIA ABDULLA Individually and as Husband and Wife

Defendant

Joann Melisz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARANTO, ROBERT JACK

Attorney at ANDREWS, BERNSTEIN, MARANTO & NICOTRA, PLLC

ANDREWS, BENJAMIN JOSEPH

Attorney at ABMN

Defendant Attorney

PORTER, RICHARD JOSEPH

Attorney at Hagelin Spencer LLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Postal Search

EXHIBIT(S)

Handwritten Notes of Process Server

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Process Server

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit of Process Server Douglas DiFilippo

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Police Accident Report

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Porter, R.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Porter, R.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Postal Search; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Handwritten Notes of Process Server; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Process Server; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Process Server Douglas DiFilippo; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Accident Report; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Porter, R.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Porter, R.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Maranto, R.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less