This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:08:57 (UTC).

ALEI PEREZ v. NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 ALEI PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Llinet Rosado. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Llinet Rosado

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alei Perez

Defendant

NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, JAMES F

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES F. SULLIVAN, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

HORAN, JOHN E

Attorney at LEWIS JOHS AVALLONE AVILES, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 12, 2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 12, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 10/21/2019.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 10/21/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 07/29/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 07/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 04/29/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 04/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Llinet M. Rosado

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Llinet M. Rosado; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of EBT Before Trial

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of EBT Before Trial; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 12, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 10/21/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 07/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 04/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Llinet M. Rosado; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of EBT Before Trial; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Horan, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less