Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/01/2020 at 14:29:17 (UTC).

ALBERT WHITE - v. - WEGMANS FOOD MARKETS et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 ALBERT WHITE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEGMANS FOOD MARKETS. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********82CV

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert White

Defendants

WEGMANS PROPERTIES INC

WEGMANS ENTERPRISES INC

WEGMANS FOOD MARKETS

WEGMANS FOOD MARKETS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OLSON, DAVID WILLIAM

Attorney at BROWN CHIARI LLP

GAMBINO, ANGELO SALVATORE

Attorney at Brown Chiari LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

ORDER - OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Properties, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Properties, Inc.; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Food Markets

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Food Markets; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Enterprises, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Enterprises, Inc.; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Properties, Inc.; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Food Markets; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Wegmans Enterprises, Inc.; Filed By: Olson, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less