Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 12:06:06 (UTC).

ALBERT NICOTINA v. RCPI LANDMARK PROPERTIES, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 ALBERT NICOTINA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RCPI LANDMARK PROPERTIES, L L C. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerald Lebovits. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerald Lebovits

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert Nicotina

Defendants and Petitioners

TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, L.P.

RCPI LANDMARK PROPERTIES, L.L.C.

WARBY PARKER, Individually

Individually and d/b/a WARBY PARKER and

WARBY PARKER RETAIL, INC.

RCPI 30 ROCK 22234849, L.L.C.

WARBY PARKER RETAIL, INC. Individually and d/b/a WARBY PARKER

Respondent

HOLT CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GJELAJ, NIKOLLA

Attorney at MULLANEY & GJELAJ PLLC

Petitioner Attorney

BRIAN T DEVENEY AIMEE D DREXLER

Defendant Attorneys

TOOMEY, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES J. TOOMEY

FAILLACE-DILLON, DAWN C.

Attorney at O'CONNOR, O'CONNOR, HINTZ & DEVENEY, LLP

DREXLER, AIMEE D

Attorney at O'CONNOR, O'CONNOR HINTZ & DEVENEY LLP

DEVENEY, BRIAN T

Attorney at O'CONNOR O'CONNOR HINTZ & DEVENEY ESQS

AMBROSINO, VINCENT S

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

Respondent Attorney

CHRISTOPHER ROBERT INVIDIATA (SP 69954)

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - NASTASI MAINTENANCE & CONTRUCTION LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - NASTASI MAINTENANCE & CONTRUCTION LLC; Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - CIROCCO & OZZIMO INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - CIROCCO & OZZIMO INC.; Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BP MECHANICAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BP MECHANICAL; Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST SECOND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT ATLAS ACON ELECTRIC SERVICE INC. AND THIRD THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS CIROCCO AND OZZIMO INC. BP MECHANICAL CORP. AND NASTASI MAINTENANCE AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST SECOND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT ATLAS ACON ELECTRIC SERVICE INC. AND THIRD THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS CIROCCO AND OZZIMO INC. BP MECHANICAL CORP. AND NASTASI MAINTENANCE AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Filed By: Invidiata, C.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Cross-Claims against Third Third-Party Defendants

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Cross-Claims against Third Third-Party Defendants; Filed By: Starkey, T.; Filed: 06/08/2020; Received: 06/08/2020

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT 3RD THIRD-PARTY S&C

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT 3RD THIRD-PARTY S&C Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

Demand for Authorizations

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL ECF AND BACK 12.18.19

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

Request For Preliminary Conference & Affirmation Of Good Faith

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

Stipulation of Discontinuance against Defendants WARBY PARKER RETAIL, INC., Individually and d/b/a WARBY PARKER and WARBY PARKER, Individually

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Answer with Demands and Notices

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Verified Complaint

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - NASTASI MAINTENANCE & CONTRUCTION LLC; Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - CIROCCO & OZZIMO INC.; Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BP MECHANICAL; Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST SECOND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT ATLAS ACON ELECTRIC SERVICE INC. AND THIRD THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS CIROCCO AND OZZIMO INC. BP MECHANICAL CORP. AND NASTASI MAINTENANCE AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Filed By: Invidiata, C.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Cross-Claims against Third Third-Party Defendants; Filed By: Starkey, T.; Filed: 06/08/2020; Received: 06/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT 3RD THIRD-PARTY S&C Filed By: Drexler, A.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Deveney, B.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL ECF AND BACK 12.18.19; Filed By: Invidiata, C.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K CERTIFICATE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE FROM NASTASI MAINTENANCE; Filed By: Invidiata, C.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request For Preliminary Conference & Affirmation Of Good Faith; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance against Defendants WARBY PARKER RETAIL, INC., Individually and d/b/a WARBY PARKER and WARBY PARKER, Individually; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Demands and Notices; Filed By: Ambrosino, V.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gjelaj, N.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less