Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 15:11:54 (UTC).

ALAN GRABOYES et al - v. - STEVEN M. HARRIS M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 ALAN GRABOYES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against STEVEN M HARRIS M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mei qing Graboyes

Alan Graboyes

Defendants

ADVANCED UROLOGY CENTERS OF NEW YORK a division of INTEGRATED MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS, PLLC

INTEGRATED MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS, PLLC

Steven M. Harris M.D.

ISLAND UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, ALAN W.

Attorney at ALAN W. CLARK. ESQ.

CLARK, ALAN W

Attorney at The Law Firm of Alan W. Clark & Associates, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

CRISCITO, TRICIA MARIE

Attorney at VARDARO & ASSOCIATES, LLP

VARDARO, PRISCO

Attorney at VARDARO & ASSOCIATES, LLP

GERSTEN, MARC ALAN

Attorney at VARDARO & ASSOCIATES, LLP

MYERS, BARBARA ANN

Attorney at Connick, Myers, McNamee & Fitzgerald, P.L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Order and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Record of Dr. Harris

EXHIBIT(S)

Lab Corp report

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

Verified Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Order and Proof of Service; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Criscito, T.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003); Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Record of Dr. Harris; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Lab Corp report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Records from Quest Diagnostics Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vardaro, P.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vardaro, P.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Myers, B.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 04/20/2017; Received: 04/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 04/20/2017; Received: 04/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less