This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:21:55 (UTC).

AIXA LAPLACA - v. - CONSTANCE R VELEZ et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 AIXA LAPLACA filed an Other lawsuit against CONSTANCE R VELEZ. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aixa Laplaca

Defendants and Petitioners

Thomas Varughese

Susamma T Varughese

Constance R Velez

Respondent

Elmer Vargas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINDER, MICHAEL

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Binder, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL JOSEPH HEMWAY (DGE26403) IRWIN DAVID MILLER

Defendant Attorneys

PFUHLER, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at CONNORS & CONNORS, P.C.

MILLER, IRWIN DAVID

Attorney at Connors & Connors PC

HEMWAY, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at Connors & Connors PC

MUMFORD, ROGER E.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF NICOLE LESPERANCE

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Judge on behalf of Defendant Varughese

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Judge on behalf of Defendant Varughese; Filed By: Miller, I.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

ORDER - RECUSAL

ORDER - RECUSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Barry, K. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Barry, K. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Barry, K. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Crossclaim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Crossclaim; Filed By: Pfuhler, R.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Judge on behalf of Defendant Varughese; Filed By: Miller, I.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RECUSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Barry, K. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Barry, K. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Barry, K. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Crossclaim; Filed By: Pfuhler, R.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less