Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:50:09 (UTC).

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY a/s/o JANE BEASLEY, GREGORY OLSEN, JAY SUGERMAN AND KELLY BEHUN, NY APT TRUST, NY APT II TRUST, JOSEPH AND MICHELLE JACOBS, AND MARK CUBAN v. ACER RESTORATIONS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY a/s/o JANE BEASLEY, GREGORY OLSEN, JAY SUGERMAN AND KELLY BEHUN, NY APT TRUST, NY APT II TRUST, JOSEPH AND MICHELLE JACOBS, AND MARK CUBAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ACER RESTORATIONS LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY a/s/o JANE BEASLEY, GREGORY OLSEN, JAY SUGERMAN AND KELLY BEHUN, NY APT TRUST, NY APT II TRUST, JOSEPH AND MICHELLE JACOBS, AND MARK CUBAN

Defendants

Maria Solange de la rocha alam

ACER RESTORATIONS LLC

Ivan Ortiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINN, ROBERT J

Attorney at GWERTZMAN, LEFKOWITZ, BURMAN, SMITH & MARCUS

Defendant Attorneys

BUNDSCHUH, STEVEN MICHAEL

Attorney at HANNUM FERETIC, PRENDERGAST & MERLINO, LLC

HOSSAIN, ASIF

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes, LLP

MODICA, ROBERT

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

ANSWER Reply to cross claims

ANSWER Reply to cross claims; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection, Notice for Examination Before Trial and Various Discovery Deman ... show more

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection, Notice for Examination Before Trial and Various Discovery Deman ... show more; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

ANSWER Answer to Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Reply to cross claims; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Modica, R.; Filed: 03/23/2020; Received: 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery and Inspection, Notice for Examination Before Trial and Various Discovery Demands; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Bundschuh, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less