Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:08:30 (UTC).

Ahmed Elmoutauakil - v. - Auto Maintenance Sales & Service, Car Washing & Detailing, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 Ahmed Elmoutauakil filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against Auto Maintenance Sales Service, Car Washing Detailing, Inc . This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnny Lee Baynes. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Johnny Lee Baynes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahmed Elmoutauakil

Defendants

Auto Maintenance Sales & Service, Car Washing & Detailing, Inc.,

Tony Boumoussa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, JUSTIN STEDMAN

Attorney at LEVINE & BLIT, PLLC

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dtd 5/31/18 nsp.

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dtd 5/31/18 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service for Motion Seq. No. 002

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service for Motion Seq. No. 002; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Tony Boumoussa

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Tony Boumoussa; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Auto Maintenance Sales & Service Car Washing & Detai ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Auto Maintenance Sales & Service Car Washing & Detai ... show more; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Defendants of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Defendants of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service, Tony Boumoussa

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service, Tony Boumoussa; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Auto Maintenance Sales and Service, Car Washing

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Auto Maintenance Sales and Service, Car Washing; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Tony Boumoussa

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Tony Boumoussa; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Auto Maintenance

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Auto Maintenance; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dtd 5/31/18 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service for Motion Seq. No. 002; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Tony Boumoussa; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Auto Maintenance Sales & Service Car Washing & Detailing, Inc.; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Defendants of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service, Tony Boumoussa; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Auto Maintenance Sales and Service, Car Washing; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Tony Boumoussa; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint - Auto Maintenance; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clark, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less