This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:54:45 (UTC).

Agricultural Logistics, LLC v. Aquahydrate, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Agricultural Logistics, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aquahydrate, Inc. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0114

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGRICULTURAL LOGISTICS LLC

Defendant

AQUAHYDRATE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRASKY, ADAM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Order

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Order; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1)

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Affidavit of J. Sam, President of Plaintiff

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Affidavit of J. Sam, President of Plaintiff; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notice of Service & Affidavit pursuant to CPLR 3215

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notice of Service & Affidavit pursuant to CPLR 3215; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Adam M. Brasky, Esq. in support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Adam M. Brasky, Esq. in support; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Summons & Complaint - Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Summons & Complaint - Invoices; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Order; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Order; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #1); Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Demand Letter of Plaintiff of 1-17-19; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Affidavit of J. Sam, President of Plaintiff; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notice of Service & Affidavit pursuant to CPLR 3215; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Adam M. Brasky, Esq. in support; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Summons & Complaint - Invoices; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brasky, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less