This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 20:57:57 (UTC).

Aestheticus Porcelain Studio, LLC - v. - Henry Schein, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 Aestheticus Porcelain Studio, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Henry Schein, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aestheticus Porcelain Studio, LLC

Defendants

Henry Schein, Inc.

E.M.I. Sterilizer & Dental Repair, Inc.

Zahn Dental Laboratory Division

Handler Manufacturing, Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SINAYSKAYA, IRENE

Attorney at Sinayskaya Yuniver, P.C.

YUNIVER, STEVEN ROSS

Defendant Attorneys

LODATO, VINCENT ROBERT

Attorney at SILLS CUMMIS ET AL

CRAWFORD, ALLYN JAMES

Attorney at CRAWFORD BRINGSLID VANDER NEUT, LLP

WEISER, DAVID

Attorney at WEISER & MCCARTHY

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court objecting to Stipulation of Discontinuance

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court objecting to Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Lodato, V.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Court Orders

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Court Orders; Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff Note of Issue and Statement of Readiness dated October 22, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff Note of Issue and Statement of Readiness dated October 22, 2019; Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - E-mail From Schein

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - E-mail From Schein; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Picture of Screw Puncturing Water Pipe

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Picture of Screw Puncturing Water Pipe; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Pictures of Ordered & Damaged Dental Lab Equipment

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Pictures of Ordered & Damaged Dental Lab Equipment; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service E.M.I.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service E.M.I.; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Handler Manufacturing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Handler Manufacturing; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Schein

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Schein; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Zahn Dental

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Zahn Dental; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court objecting to Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Lodato, V.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Court Orders; Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff Note of Issue and Statement of Readiness dated October 22, 2019; Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Weiser, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lodato, V.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - E-mail From Schein; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Picture of Screw Puncturing Water Pipe; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Pictures of Ordered & Damaged Dental Lab Equipment; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service E.M.I.; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Handler Manufacturing; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Schein; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Zahn Dental; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sinayskaya, I.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less