Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 02:36:18 (UTC).

Admiral Indemnity Company a/s/o 39 Great Jones Current Project, Inc. v. 41 Great Jones Holding, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Admiral Indemnity Company a/s/o 39 Great Jones Current Project, Inc filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against 41 Great Jones Holding, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Admiral Indemnity Company a/s/o 39 Great Jones Current Project, Inc.

Defendants

BDG Construction Corp.

CCC Construction Group Inc.

41 Great Jones Holding, LLC

Pillori Associates, P.A.

C.C.C. Renovation Inc.

Malbro Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WENIG, ALAN B

Attorney at WENIG & WENIG

Defendant Attorneys

MASCOLO, NEIL C.

Attorney at VIGORITO, BARKER, PATTERSON, NICHOLS & PORTER, LLP

VASQUEZ, CARMEN MARIA

Attorney at O'Connor Redd LLP

BEITLER, JEFFREY R

Attorney at Goldstein Law, P.C.

MALDONADO, ROSALYN

Attorney at Rosalyn Maldonado P.C.

NISNEWITZ, CRAIG MILES

Attorney at Hollander Law Group, PLLC

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Cross-Claim of Defendant 41 Great Jones Holdings LLC

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Cross-Claim of Defendant 41 Great Jones Holdings LLC; Filed By: Nisnewitz, C.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Cross-Claims of Defendant BDG Construction Corp.

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Cross-Claims of Defendant BDG Construction Corp.; Filed By: Nisnewitz, C.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Cross-Claims by BDG Contruction Corp.

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Cross-Claims by BDG Contruction Corp.; Filed By: Maldonado, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Cross-Claims by 41 Great Jones Holdings, LLC

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Cross-Claims by 41 Great Jones Holdings, LLC; Filed By: Maldonado, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Vigorito Barker Patterson Nichols & Porter LLP; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos CCC Construction Group Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos CCC Construction Group Inc.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos 41 Great Jones Holdings, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos 41 Great Jones Holdings, LLC; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BDG Construction Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BDG Construction Corp.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Malbro Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Malbro Inc.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Pillori Associates, P.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Pillori Associates, P.A.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Ohalloran, K.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Ohalloran, K.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Cross-Claim of Defendant 41 Great Jones Holdings LLC; Filed By: Nisnewitz, C.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Cross-Claims of Defendant BDG Construction Corp.; Filed By: Nisnewitz, C.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Cross-Claims by BDG Contruction Corp.; Filed By: Maldonado, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Cross-Claims by 41 Great Jones Holdings, LLC; Filed By: Maldonado, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Vasquez, C.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Vigorito Barker Patterson Nichols & Porter LLP; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Production of Documents; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Vigorito Barker Patterson Nichols & Porter LLP; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos C.C.C. Renovation Inc.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos CCC Construction Group Inc.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos 41 Great Jones Holdings, LLC; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BDG Construction Corp.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Malbro Inc.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Pillori Associates, P.A.; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Ohalloran, K.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Mascolo, N. - filed by Ohalloran, K.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wenig, A. - filed by Wenig, A.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less