This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 00:09:41 (UTC).

Adirondack Mountain Reserve v. Town Of Keene et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Adirondack Mountain Reserve filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Town Of Keene. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Glen Bruening. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0351

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Glen Bruening

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adirondack Mountain Reserve

Defendants

Donna Bramer

Keene Central School District

Town Of Keene

Donna Bramer ASSESSOR

KEENE TOWN OF (THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS, DENNIS JOHN

Attorney at McPhillips Fitzgerald & Cullum LLP

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS BUETTNER, KARLA MARIE

Attorney at BARTLETT, PONTIFF, STEWART & RHODES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

ORDER - CONSOLIDATION

ORDER - CONSOLIDATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1); Filed By: Williams Buettner, K.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

PETITION *Corrected*

PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CONSOLIDATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1); Filed By: Williams Buettner, K.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Phillips, D.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less