This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 06/28/2020 at 07:03:40 (UTC).

Adil Mustafaraj v. Paul Hickok et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 Adil Mustafaraj filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Paul Hickok. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adil Mustafaraj as Administrator of the Estate of EDLIRA MUSTAFARAJ, Deceased, and ADIL MUSTAFARAJ individually

Defendants

Paul Hickok

PAUL L HICKOK AND SON INC

SALVADORE TREE SERVICE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUSANO, GARY A

SMITH, STEPHEN MICHAEL

CUSANO, GARY ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorneys

GOZIGIAN, EDWARD WARREN GARO

SMITH, KIRBY JERMAINE

KESSLER, LEONARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/13/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with Decision & Order of the Hon. Victor G. Grossman, J.S.C.

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with Decision & Order of the Hon. Victor G. Grossman, J.S.C.; Filed By: Smith, K.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Kessler, L.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Paul Hickok

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Paul Hickok; Filed By: Cusano, G.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

DEMAND FOR: INSURANCE INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR: INSURANCE INFORMATION; Filed By: Cusano, G.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cusano, G.; Filed: 04/11/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/13/2020

DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/13/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with Decision & Order of the Hon. Victor G. Grossman, J.S.C.; Filed By: Smith, K.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Kessler, L.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
100 More Docket Entries
08/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Paul Hickok; Filed By: Cusano, G.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: INSURANCE INFORMATION; Filed By: Cusano, G.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gozigian, E.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cusano, G.; Filed: 04/11/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less