This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:52:28 (UTC).

ADELINE SENAT-JOSEPH - v. - ADAM'S EUROPEAN CONTRACTING INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ADELINE SENAT-JOSEPH filed an Other lawsuit against ADAM'S EUROPEAN CONTRACTING INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adeline Senat-joseph

Defendants

Piotr P. Czerniec

ADAM'S EUROPEAN CONTRACTING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANKEL, STEPHEN H

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF STEPHEN H FRANKEL

TZANETEAS, NICHOLAS ELIAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS E. TZANETEAS

Defendant Attorneys

FLAMHAFT, JONATHAN PETER

Attorney at Smith Mazure Director Wilkins Young & Yagerman, P.C.

URY, STACIA JAYE

Attorney at Smith Mazure, P.C.

ECCHER, ANN PATRICIA

Attorney at Smith Mazure, P.C.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Eccher, A.; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 09/19/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 09/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Eccher, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tzaneteas, N.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Supp 3101(d) Response

EXHIBIT(S) - F Supp 3101(d) Response; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Backer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Backer; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tzaneteas, N.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Executed Order to Show Cause

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Executed Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Fax

EXHIBIT(S) - G Fax; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

ORDER - OTHER Dated 03/20/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 03/20/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Tzaneteas, N.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Eccher, A.; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tzaneteas, N.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Tzaneteas, N.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tzaneteas, N.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Executed Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Backer; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Fax; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Supp 3101(d) Response; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E 2nd Sup 3101(d) Response; Filed By: Ury, S.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Strike/Compel; Filed By: Flamhaft, J.; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 03/20/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 09/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Eccher, A.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Frankel, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less