This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 04/21/2023 at 18:01:44 (UTC).

ADAM GAGNON v. CODY DELLES et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 ADAM GAGNON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CODY DELLES. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0641

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Gagnon

Defendants

Cody Delles

Detra Delles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANEY, MAUREEN ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorneys

CASINI, CHRISTIAN CARLO

GUETTI, CHRISTOPHER ALAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: St. Louis, J.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: St. Louis, J.; Filed: 04/02/2021; Received: 04/02/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: St. Louis, J.; Filed: 04/02/2021; Received: 04/02/2021

ANSWER Answer (Cody Delles)

ANSWER Answer (Cody Delles); Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

DEMAND FOR: Art. 31 Discl. Demands

DEMAND FOR: Art. 31 Discl. Demands; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demands for Medicare.Medicaid Lien info

DEMAND FOR: Demands for Medicare.Medicaid Lien info; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Guetti, C.; Filed: 04/19/2021; Received: 04/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Demands for Medicare.Medicaid Lien info; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Art. 31 Discl. Demands; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER Answer (Cody Delles); Filed By: Casini, C.; Filed: 04/15/2021; Received: 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: St. Louis, J.; Filed: 04/02/2021; Received: 04/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: St. Louis, J.; Filed: 04/02/2021; Received: 04/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: St. Louis, J.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less