This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 14:38:17 (UTC).

ACMG Federal Credit Union - v. - Michele A Loyd et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 ACMG Federal Credit Union filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Michele A Loyd. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3076

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACMG Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Raymond E Loyd

Michele A Loyd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, AMANDA C

Attorney at Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/11/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Additional Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Additional Notice; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Raymond

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Raymond; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Michele

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Michele; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Military searches

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Military searches; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Raymond

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Raymond; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Michele

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Michele; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Commencement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Additional Notice; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Raymond; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing - Michele; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Attorney Fees Statement; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Claims for Attorneys Fees; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Military searches; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Raymond; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Michele; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less