Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 12:09:02 (UTC).

Accounts Retrievable System LLC as assignee of Chemical Bank - v. - Steuben Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 Accounts Retrievable System LLC as assignee of Chemical Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Steuben Trust Company. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********26CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEMICAL BANK

Defendants

Steuben Trust Company

Robert O Duffy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAIDENBAUM, JEFFREY A

Attorney at MAIDENBAUM & ASSOCIATES P.L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of the petition on Steuben Trust

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of the petition on Steuben Trust; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of the petition on Robert O Duffy

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of the petition on Robert O Duffy; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER notice of petition

RJI -RE: OTHER notice of petition; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - e proposed order

EXHIBIT(S) - e proposed order; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - d banks reposonse to the subpoena duces tecum Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - d banks reposonse to the subpoena duces tecum Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - c information subpoena Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - c information subpoena Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - b assignment of judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - b assignment of judgment; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - a judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - a judgment; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

PETITION notice of petition

PETITION notice of petition; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of the petition on Steuben Trust; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of the petition on Robert O Duffy; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER notice of petition; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - e proposed order; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - d banks reposonse to the subpoena duces tecum Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c information subpoena Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b assignment of judgment; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a judgment; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION notice of petition; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less