Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 19:48:47 (UTC).

ACADEMY GROUP PROPERTIES, LLC et al v. WORKERS' COMPENSATION BOARD OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 ACADEMY GROUP PROPERTIES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against WORKERS' COMPENSATION BOARD OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3-19

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yehuda Amar

ACADEMY GROUP PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

WORKERS' COMPENSATION BOARD OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGUM, STEVEN G

Attorney at STEVEN G. LEGUM

Defendant Attorney

DURAND, ADELE

Attorney at State of New York Office of the Attorney General

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION; Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION to dismiss

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION to dismiss; Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER Petition - Previously Filed

RJI -RE: OTHER Petition - Previously Filed; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I instruction form

EXHIBIT(S) - I instruction form; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H Board decision dated November 16, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - H Board decision dated November 16, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Application for Board Review dated August 5, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G Application for Board Review dated August 5, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Amended decision dated July 3, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Amended decision dated July 3, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Decision dated July 2, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E Decision dated July 2, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Board decision dated May 14, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Board decision dated May 14, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Rebuttal dated February 5, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Rebuttal dated February 5, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Application for Board Review dated January 5, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Application for Board Review dated January 5, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision dated December 6, 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision dated December 6, 2017; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION; Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION to dismiss; Filed By: Durand, A.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Petition - Previously Filed; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I instruction form; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Board decision dated November 16, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Application for Board Review dated August 5, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Amended decision dated July 3, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Decision dated July 2, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Board decision dated May 14, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Rebuttal dated February 5, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Application for Board Review dated January 5, 2018; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision dated December 6, 2017; Filed By: Legum, S.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less