This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:35:35 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC v. CAROL A TEDESCO

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAROL A TEDESCO. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

Carol A Tedesco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT R714175V709335

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT R714175V709335; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/01/2019; Received: 06/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/01/2019; Received: 06/01/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court

NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

DEFECT CHECKLIST

DEFECT CHECKLIST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet

ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFECT CHECKLIST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Administrative Review to the Court; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/01/2019; Received: 06/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 06/01/2019; Received: 06/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT R714175V709335; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less