This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:12:35 (UTC).

ABOULAYE SANGARE v. 985 BRUCKNER BOULEVARD HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 ABOULAYE SANGARE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 985 BRUCKNER BOULEVARD HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucindo Suarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lucindo Suarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aboulaye Sangare

Defendants

COMMUNITY ACCESS INC.

985 BRUCKNER BOULEVARD HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION

MONADNOCK CONSTRUCTION, INC

985 BRUCKNER BOULEVARD OWNERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, JAMES F

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES F. SULLIVAN, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

FILARDI, ELIZABETH ANN

Attorney at MORRIS DUFFY ALONSO & FALEY

FRANKLIN, DAVID B

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER DATED: DECEMBER 17, 2019

STIPULATION - OTHER DATED: DECEMBER 17, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED:09/24/19

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED:09/24/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stip of Disc of X-Claims

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stip of Disc of X-Claims; Filed By: Filardi, E.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent 2 Change Atty

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent 2 Change Atty; Filed By: Filardi, E.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 6/11/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 6/11/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Franklin, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Franklin, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Filardi, E.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Manadnock Construction, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Manadnock Construction, Inc.; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Community Access, Inc

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Community Access, Inc; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 985 Bruckner Boulevard Owners

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 985 Bruckner Boulevard Owners; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 985 Bruckner Boulevard Housing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 985 Bruckner Boulevard Housing; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER DATED: DECEMBER 17, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED:09/24/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stip of Disc of X-Claims; Filed By: Filardi, E.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent 2 Change Atty; Filed By: Filardi, E.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 6/11/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Franklin, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Franklin, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Filardi, E.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Manadnock Construction, Inc.; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Community Access, Inc; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 985 Bruckner Boulevard Owners; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 985 Bruckner Boulevard Housing; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sullivan, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less