This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 23:57:23 (UTC).

AA, an infant, by and on behalf of her mother and natural guardian, et al v. Hammondsport Central School District et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 AA, an infant, by and on behalf of her mother and natural guardian filed an Other lawsuit against Hammondsport Central School District. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********15CV

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bb

AA

Defendants

Tad Rounds

HAMMONDSPORT CENTRAL SCHOOL BOARD EDUCATION

Superintendent Hammondsport

David Forsythe

Adam Peck

Tara Chapman

Hammondsport Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LABARBERA, ANNE LOUISE

Attorney at Thomas LaBarbera Counselors At Law Professional Corporation

THOMAS, KATHLEEN REBECCA

Attorney at Thomas LaBarbera Counselors at Law, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

PIPER, SCOTT DEWITT

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Service Rounds

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Service Rounds; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Forsythe

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Forsythe; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Bowers

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Bowers; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #01)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Email Clarifying Date for Opposing Counsel

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Email Clarifying Date for Opposing Counsel; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Thomas, K.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI); Filed By: Piper, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Chapman

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Chapman; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service School District; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Board of Education

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Board of Education; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Peck

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Peck; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Cover Letter Notice To Opposing Counsel

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Cover Letter Notice To Opposing Counsel; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI); Filed By: Piper, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Service Rounds; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Chapman; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Forsythe; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service School District; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Board of Education; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Bowers; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Peck; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #01); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Email Clarifying Date for Opposing Counsel; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Cover Letter Notice To Opposing Counsel; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Labarbera, A.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Thomas, K.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less