This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:21:58 (UTC).

A. T. et al - v. - Amboy Bus Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 A T filed an Other lawsuit against Amboy Bus Co , Inc. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A. T. , a minor under the age of 14 years, by his mother and natural guardian, Quianna Jackson

Quianna Jackson , Individually

Defendants

Atlantic Express Transportation Corp.

Atlantic Express Transportation Group Inc.

Amboy Bus Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON, WALTER FRANCIS

Attorney at LYNN LAW FIRM, LLP

Defendant Attorney

CONQUEST, DEBORAH ANNE

Attorney at Silverman Shin & Byrne PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 16, 2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 16, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Compliance with Stip attached

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Compliance with Stip attached; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOI with Affidavit of Service

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOI with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/7/2019.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/7/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

ORDER - OTHER DATED: 09/12/2019

ORDER - OTHER DATED: 09/12/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 07/15/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 07/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected* DATED 5/20/2019.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected* DATED 5/20/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 2/13/2019.

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 2/13/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 10/31/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 10/31/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation Of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation Of Good Faith; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation In Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation In Support; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Conquest, D.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Atlantic Express Transportation Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Atlantic Express Transportation Corp.; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Atlantic Express Transportation Group Inc

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Atlantic Express Transportation Group Inc; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Amboy Bus Co., Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Amboy Bus Co., Inc.; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT S&C with attorney verification

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT S&C with attorney verification; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 16, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Compliance with Stip attached; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOI with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/7/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER DATED: 09/12/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 07/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected* DATED 5/20/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 2/13/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 10/31/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 9/6/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation Of Good Faith; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation In Support; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Conquest, D. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2018; Received: 07/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Conquest, D.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Atlantic Express Transportation Corp.; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Atlantic Express Transportation Group Inc; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE A/S - Amboy Bus Co., Inc.; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT S&C with attorney verification; Filed By: Benson, W.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less