This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 18:06:39 (UTC).

A. A. v. THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 A A filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell J Danziger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mitchell J Danziger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. A. , an infant under the age of 14 years, by his Mother and Natural Guardian, BELKIS AVILA

Defendants

NEW YORK SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

THE NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESCH, DAVID PETER

Attorney at Lesch & Lesch,, PC

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

KASHER, CHEN

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Reply to Court Order 10.15.19

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Reply to Court Order 10.15.19; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION *Corrected*

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION *Corrected*; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Response Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Response Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PC Order; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 10/15/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 10/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

NOTICE Preliminary Conference Notice 09/24/19

NOTICE Preliminary Conference Notice 09/24/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Reply to Court Order 10.15.19; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION *Corrected*; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Response Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PC Order; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 10/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Preliminary Conference Notice 09/24/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lesch, D.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less