This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 23:13:29 (UTC).

543 E GENESEE PARTNERS, LLC - v. - COMMISSIONER OF ASSESSMENT OF THE CITY OF SYRACUSE et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 543 E GENESEE PARTNERS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COMMISSIONER OF ASSESSMENT OF THE CITY OF SYRACUSE. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1808

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

543 E GENESEE PARTNERS, LLC

Defendants

COMMISSIONER OF ASSESSMENT OF THE CITY OF SYRACUSE

THE CITY OF SYRACUSE, COUNTY OF ONONDAGA, NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROE, KEVIN GREGORY

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON LLP

Defendant Attorney

GEARY, AMANDA ROSE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Geary, A.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Geary, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Geary, A.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Geary, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Roe, K.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less